NY S02003 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid To Localities Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid To Localities Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Assembly | THRU LINE VETO MEMO.136 |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | LINE VETO MEMO.65 |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.53 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.42 |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | substituted for a3003d |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-04-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.555 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2003D |
2017-04-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2003C |
2017-04-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2003B |
2017-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-02-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2003A |
2017-02-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03003 (Same As) 2017-04-06 - substituted by s2003d