NY S02003 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - SIGNED CHAP.546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a school district which levies taxes on behalf of a school district public library may charge back to such public library the portion of any court ordered refund attributable to library purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a school district which levies taxes on behalf of a school district public library may charge back to such public library the portion of any court ordered refund attributable to library purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.546
2014-12-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.440
2014-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a5310
2014-06-10Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2014-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-05-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-05-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.879
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2013-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-06-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-06-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-06-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1045
2013-01-09SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05310 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s2003

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback