NY S01992 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for certain death benefits to correction officers, correction officer-sergeants, correction officer-captains, assistant wardens, associate wardens or wardens employed by Westchester county.
Title
Provides for certain death benefits to correction officers, correction officer-sergeants, correction officer-captains, assistant wardens, associate wardens or wardens employed by Westchester county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06438 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees