NY S01984 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of making a terroristic threat against a police officer; makes such crime a class C felony.
Title
Establishes the crime of making a terroristic threat against a police officer; makes such crime a class C felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.225 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.260 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |