NY S01974 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to contracted network pharmacy use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to contracted network pharmacy use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-03-25Assemblyordered to third reading cal.365
2024-03-25Assemblysubstituted for a1219a
2024-03-20Assemblyreferred to labor
2024-03-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.437
2024-01-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 1974A
2024-01-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-02-15Assemblyreferred to labor
2023-02-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-02-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-02-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-02-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-01-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.257
2023-01-17SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A01219 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - substituted by s1974a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback