NY S01971 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to designating the month of May "Korean American Family Month".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to designating the month of May "Korean American Family Month".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1364
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-12Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2017-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.746
2017-01-11SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A01521 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback