NY S01944 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires property owners to dedicate certain residential units to rent regulated status following demolition and new construction or substantial renovation.
Title
Requires property owners to dedicate certain residential units to rent regulated status following demolition and new construction or substantial renovation.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1944A |
2023-05-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08446 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to housing