NY S01931 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits prison work release programs from operating in areas zoned as exclusively residential by a municipality.
Title
Prohibits prison work release programs from operating in areas zoned as exclusively residential by a municipality.
Sponsors
Sen. James Alesi [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.981 |
2011-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |