NY S01921 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1921A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1921A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an agricultural crop loss personal income tax credit when such loss is due to frost injury.
Title
Creates an agricultural crop loss personal income tax credit when such loss is due to frost injury.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1921A |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04471 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - print number 4471a