NY S01904 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the expiration of and makes permanent provisions of law establishing the property tax cap.
Title
Eliminates the expiration of and makes permanent provisions of law establishing the property tax cap.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.40 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |