NY S01883 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1883B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1883B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Big Five African Trophies Act" relating to banning the importation, transportation and possession of certain African wildlife species and products.
Title
Enacts the "Big Five African Trophies Act" relating to banning the importation, transportation and possession of certain African wildlife species and products.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] |
Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1883B |
2018-03-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1883A |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04010 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken