NY S01822 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 1822A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 1822A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to provisions concerning debt collection procedures.
Title
Relates to provisions concerning debt collection procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1822A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08432 (Same As) 2012-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.557