NY S01821 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes applied behavioral analysis provided by a licensed behavior analyst or certified behavior analyst assistant for treatment of autism spectrum disorder under standard coverage for Medicaid recipients.
Title
Includes applied behavioral analysis provided by a licensed behavior analyst or certified behavior analyst assistant for treatment of autism spectrum disorder under standard coverage for Medicaid recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.720 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02802 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means