NY S01814 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to establish standards for and a program of inspection and certification of green roofs prior to and after installation, including standards for environmentally acceptable chemical fertilizers and the testing of runoff water for evidence of such fertilizers; further establishes a green roof installation tax credit in the amount of fifty-five percent of qualified expenditures with a credit maximum of five thousand dollars.
Title
Requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to establish standards for and a program of inspection and certification of green roofs prior to and after installation, including standards for environmentally acceptable chemical fertilizers and the testing of runoff water for evidence of such fertilizers; further establishes a green roof installation tax credit in the amount of fifty-five percent of qualified expenditures with a credit maximum of five thousand dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00101 (Same As) 2016-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means