NY S01801 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the category of "qualified group practice" for medical, dental and podiatric practices that comply with certain standards and authorizes such practices to operate a malpractice prevention program.
Title
Establishes the category of "qualified group practice" for medical, dental and podiatric practices that comply with certain standards and authorizes such practices to operate a malpractice prevention program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.756 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01164 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes