NY S01799 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes expedited partner therapy for certain sexually transmitted infections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes expedited partner therapy for certain sexually transmitted infections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-03-25Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-25Assemblyordered to third reading cal.107
2019-03-25Assemblysubstituted for a2998
2019-03-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-03-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.192
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A02998 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - substituted by s1799

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback