NY S01783 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to establish and implement an infection inspection audit and checklist on nursing homes.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to establish and implement an infection inspection audit and checklist on nursing homes.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.129 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.768 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.445 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a6057a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1783A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.351 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.351 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01999 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - enacting clause stricken
A06057 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s1783a
A06057 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s1783a