NY S01726 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1726A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1726A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Title
Provides for accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1726A |
2024-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05613 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS