NY S01714 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1714B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1714B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of potassium iodide in a radiological emergency.
Title
Relates to the distribution of potassium iodide in a radiological emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1714B |
2016-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-03-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1714A |
2016-03-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A04611 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - enacting clause stricken
A06231 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - reported referred to ways and means
A06231 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - reported referred to ways and means