NY S01674 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Title
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1674A |
2013-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00414 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - REFERRED TO HEALTH