NY S01668 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1668A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1668A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the New York state health care quality and cost containment commission shall: evaluate each mandated benefit; investigate current practices of health plans with regard to the mandated benefit; investigate the potential premium impact of repealing and/or modifying the mandated benefits on all segments of the insurance market; hold at least two public hearings; submit a report to the legislature; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that the New York state health care quality and cost containment commission shall: evaluate each mandated benefit; investigate current practices of health plans with regard to the mandated benefit; investigate the potential premium impact of repealing and/or modifying the mandated benefits on all segments of the insurance market; hold at least two public hearings; submit a report to the legislature; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1668A |
2018-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05281 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in insurance