NY S01650 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to fund and conduct the empire state games on an annual basis.
Title
Directs the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to fund and conduct the empire state games on an annual basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1332 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1534 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04417 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development