NY S01641 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and distribution of powdered pure caffeine.
Title
Prohibits the sale and distribution of powdered pure caffeine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.77 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.819 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08144 (Same As) 2016-06-13 - print number 8144a