NY S01635 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3423
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3423
Summary
Prevents individuals from being denied standing in private actions alleging violations of the environmental quality review provisions of the environmental conservation law solely on the basis that the injury alleged by such individual does not differ in kind or degree from the injury that would be suffered by the public at large.
Title
Prevents individuals from being denied standing in private actions alleging violations of the environmental quality review provisions of the environmental conservation law solely on the basis that the injury alleged by such individual does not differ in kind or degree from the injury that would be suffered by the public at large.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3423 | |
2009-05-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-06 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-05 | 1ST REPORT CAL.252 | |
2009-04-07 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-02-03 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01635&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |