NY S01609 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides immunity from administrative action against New York city fire officers who, due to lack of training, are effectively unable to properly conduct building inspections.
Title
Provides immunity from administrative action against New York city fire officers who, due to lack of training, are effectively unable to properly conduct building inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.696 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1609A |
2018-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01995 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - print number 1995a