NY S01577 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1577A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1577A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the city of Syracuse to offer an optional retirement plan to police officer Thomas R. Nicolini.
Title
Relates to authorizing the city of Syracuse to offer an optional retirement plan to police officer Thomas R. Nicolini.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1577A |
2016-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04287 (Same As) 2016-06-13 - print number 4287a