NY S01569 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1569A
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1569A
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the end toxic home flipping act; imposes a tax on the transfer of certain residential properties which are sold within two years of the prior conveyance of such property; exempts certain purchases of residential properties from mortgage recording taxes; imposes a tax on the transfer of certain properties in the city of New York which are sold for one million dollars or more.
Title
Establishes the end toxic home flipping act; imposes a tax on the transfer of certain residential properties which are sold within two years of the prior conveyance of such property; exempts certain purchases of residential properties from mortgage recording taxes; imposes a tax on the transfer of certain properties in the city of New York which are sold for one million dollars or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1569A |
2024-01-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A01023 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - print number 1023a