NY S01491 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1491A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes registration as an organ donor in the donate life registry on SUNY, CUNY and library card applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes registration as an organ donor in the donate life registry on SUNY, CUNY and library card applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 1491A
2019-05-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-05-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A05785 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - print number 5785a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback