NY S01466 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.649
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.649
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law.
Title
Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.649 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.748 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a250a |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 1466 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1466A |
2023-02-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.345 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00250 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s1466