NY S01453 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - SIGNED CHAP.106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - SIGNED CHAP.106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending a moratorium on utility termination of services after the COVID-19 state of emergency is lifted or expires for a period of 180 days after such expiration or until December 31, 2021 whichever is later.
Title
Relates to extending a moratorium on utility termination of services after the COVID-19 state of emergency is lifted or expires for a period of 180 days after such expiration or until December 31, 2021 whichever is later.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.106 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.47 |
2021-03-31 | Assembly | substituted for a6255a |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-30 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-03-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1453B |
2021-03-25 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-02-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1453A |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.116 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06609 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
A06255 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - substituted by s1453b
A06255 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - substituted by s1453b