NY S01421 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - SIGNED CHAP.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - SIGNED CHAP.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires tattoo studios and body piercing studios to use single-use needles and inks, to obtain consent forms from customers and to maintain customer consent forms for a period of not less than seven years.
Title
Requires tattoo studios and body piercing studios to use single-use needles and inks, to obtain consent forms from customers and to maintain customer consent forms for a period of not less than seven years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.230 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.61 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a1334 |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.392 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01334 (Same As) 2015-06-08 - substituted by s1421