NY S01417 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to offenses involving sexual performances by a child; increases penalties for offenses involving promoting and possessing the sexual performance of a child.
Title
Relates to offenses involving sexual performances by a child; increases penalties for offenses involving promoting and possessing the sexual performance of a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.57 |
2012-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1417B |
2012-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-02-07 | Senate | AMENDED 1417A |
2011-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.61 |
2011-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00281 (Same As) 2012-01-13 - print number 281a
S00620 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S00620 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN