NY S01388 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1388B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1388B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a New York state residential property tax relief act for public education aid apportionment for certain school years; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Provides a New York state residential property tax relief act for public education aid apportionment for certain school years; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1388B |
2022-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1388A |
2021-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00939 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - print number 939b