NY S01381 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1381A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1381A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the board of regents and the state education department to conduct a comprehensive study of nursing education programs across the state and develop a model for improved articulation of the education program for career mobility from one classification to another in the field of nursing; enacts the "Development of Model for Articulation and Career Mobility Act".
Title
Authorizes and directs the board of regents and the state education department to conduct a comprehensive study of nursing education programs across the state and develop a model for improved articulation of the education program for career mobility from one classification to another in the field of nursing; enacts the "Development of Model for Articulation and Career Mobility Act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1381A |
2014-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06075 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - print number 6075a