NY S01369 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to establishing the stretch limousine passenger safety task force; authorizes the stretch limousine passenger safety task force to continue to hold public hearings and meetings to review the actions taken by the state and to publish a report of its findings.
Title
Extends provisions relating to establishing the stretch limousine passenger safety task force; authorizes the stretch limousine passenger safety task force to continue to hold public hearings and meetings to review the actions taken by the state and to publish a report of its findings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.68 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.466 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a6922 |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.142 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06922 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - substituted by s1369