NY S01331 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the offense of defrauding the government in the first degree and expands the definition of conspiracy in the fourth degree; relates to expanding the definition of tax fraud acts.
Title
Creates the offense of defrauding the government in the first degree and expands the definition of conspiracy in the fourth degree; relates to expanding the definition of tax fraud acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.367 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |