NY S01315 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transitional services for inmates released from state correctional facilities.
Title
Relates to transitional services for inmates released from state correctional facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A858 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.12 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00858 (Same As) 2015-03-13 - signed chap.5