NY S01283 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the order in which candidates appear on the ballot; requires that offices shall be listed on the ballot in descending order based on the size of the electorate and requires certain federal offices to be listed before state, county or local offices.
Title
Relates to the order in which candidates appear on the ballot; requires that offices shall be listed on the ballot in descending order based on the size of the electorate and requires certain federal offices to be listed before state, county or local offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2022-01-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.6 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1051 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04582 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to election law