NY S01264 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of transportation network company services; establishes the New York State TNC Accessibility Task Force.
Title
Provides for the regulation of transportation network company services; establishes the New York State TNC Accessibility Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.26 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |