NY S01235 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the promotion of civil service exams and requires the state civil service department to make efforts to utilize state university of New York educational opportunity centers when selecting testing sites.
Title
Relates to the promotion of civil service exams and requires the state civil service department to make efforts to utilize state university of New York educational opportunity centers when selecting testing sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.524 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1235A |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.153 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01316 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental employees