NY S01214 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits, in cities having a population of one million or more, the annual increase in real property taxes.
Title
Limits, in cities having a population of one million or more, the annual increase in real property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.181 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1214A |
2018-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.25 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01090 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - print number 1090a