NY S01171 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows disabled students to increase duration limits for student financial aid awards.
Title
Allows disabled students to increase duration limits for student financial aid awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1070 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07613 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education