NY S01149 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision, in consultation with the commissioner of motor vehicles and the federal bureau of prisons, to develop a program to provide an identification card to each inmate upon the release of such inmate from custody.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision, in consultation with the commissioner of motor vehicles and the federal bureau of prisons, to develop a program to provide an identification card to each inmate upon the release of such inmate from custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.718 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04905 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.158