NY S01145 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - PRINT NUMBER 1145A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - PRINT NUMBER 1145A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Title
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1145A |
2020-02-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01051 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 1051a