NY S01145 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8642
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8642
Summary
Requires a reduction in sulfur emissions by 2012 for all heating oil used in the state and allows the governor to suspend such reduction if there is not an adequate supply of the required fuel.
Title
Requires a reduction in sulfur emissions by 2012 for all heating oil used in the state and allows the governor to suspend such reduction if there is not an adequate supply of the required fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8642 | |
2009-07-16 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.899 | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-08 | PRINT NUMBER 1145A | |
2009-06-08 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2009-02-24 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-01-26 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10108 (Same As) 2010-03-04 - referred to environmental conservation
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01145&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |