NY S01129 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 1129A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 1129A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an urban and community development program in the urban development corporation; defines relevant terms; provides for procedures to be followed in implementing the program; provides for preference to be given to economic assistance for projects in distressed areas.
Title
Establishes an urban and community development program in the urban development corporation; defines relevant terms; provides for procedures to be followed in implementing the program; provides for preference to be given to economic assistance for projects in distressed areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Thomas Duane [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | PRINT NUMBER 1129A | |
2010-05-06 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2009-06-03 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-01-26 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |