NY S01074 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of unlawful defilement of a water supply; provides that a person is guilty of such crime when he introduces, places, or causes to be introduced or placed a defiling agent into a water supply; makes definitions; establishes such crime as a class B felony.
Title
Creates the crime of unlawful defilement of a water supply; provides that a person is guilty of such crime when he introduces, places, or causes to be introduced or placed a defiling agent into a water supply; makes definitions; establishes such crime as a class B felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.328 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-03-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.140 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01882 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to codes