NY S01066 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment, membership and duties of the state insurance advisory board.
Title
Relates to the establishment, membership and duties of the state insurance advisory board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A376 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.20 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00376 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - signed chap.10