NY S01065 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to promote education in hunting, fishing and outdoor education in high school physical education courses.
Title
Requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to promote education in hunting, fishing and outdoor education in high school physical education courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.67 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.263 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04018 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation