NY S01030 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Title
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2018-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1030A |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.407 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.277 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A06779 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - print number 6779a